Web14 apr. 2024 · Chief Minister of Uttarakhand Chief Secretary and Secretaries District Magistrates Citizen Charter Police Department Uttarakhand Directorate of Silk, … WebVanaf 27 oktober 2024 zijn er zeven levende voormalige ministers van Uttarakhand: Levende voormalige Chief Ministers Tirath Singh Rawat (2024) 9 april 1964 (Leeftijd 58) Trivendra Singh Rawat (2024-2024) 20 december 1960 (Leeftijd 61) Harish Rawat (2014–2016, 2016–2024) 27 april 1948 (Leeftijd 74) Vijay Bahuguna (2012-2014)
List of Chief Ministers (CM) of Uttarakhand From 2000 till 2024
Web5 mrt. 2024 · The Chief Minister is the head of the party elected by the people as well as the elected state government. The Governor appoints the Chief Minister, whose Council … calculate the percentage
List of chief ministers of Uttarakhand Detailed Pedia
Web28 okt. 2024 · The Shortest tenure Chief Minister of Uttarakhand was Bhagat Singh Koshyari. The Longest tenure Chief Minister of Uttarakhand was Narayan Datt Tiwari. … WebContact details including contact numbers, FAX, Email ID of the Chief Minister, other Ministers, designated offices and the officers of various departments of Uttarakhand Honorable Chief Minister (CM) of Uttarakhand - Office- (0135)2650433, 2655177, Fax- (0135)2712827 Residence- (0135)2539004, 2539006, Fax- (0135)2539006 Email ID: - … Web9 mrt. 2024 · Candidates for Uttarakhand CM post (L-R) Rajya Sabha MP Anil Baluni, Maharashtra Governor Bhagat Singh Koshyari, Union Education Minister Ramesh Pokhriyal, Uttarakhand Minister Dhan Singh Rawat In Short Trivendra Singh Rawat resigned after meeting BJP national leadership on Tuesday calculate the percentage difference in excel